NY S05946 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - POCKET VETO - VETO.294
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - POCKET VETO - VETO.294
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Syracuse city school district regional STEAM high school to provide instruction to students in the Onondaga, Cortland and Madison county BOCES and the central New York region in the areas of science, technology, engineering, arts and mathematics (STEAM).
Title
Establishes the Syracuse city school district regional STEAM high school to provide instruction to students in the Onondaga, Cortland and Madison county BOCES and the central New York region in the areas of science, technology, engineering, arts and mathematics (STEAM).
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Assembly | POCKET VETO - VETO.294 |
2019-12-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.557 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7914a |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1591 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5946B |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5946A |
2019-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07914 (Same As) 2021-01-22 - POCKET VETO - VETO.294