NY S05954 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that where a correction officer, sergeant, captain, corporal, lieutenant, deputy warden or warden employed by the New York state department of corrections and community supervision, the department of correction of the city of New York or any county or municipality files a claim for mental injury premised upon extraordinary work-related stress incurred in a work-related emergency, the board may not disallow the claim, upon a factual finding that the stress was not greater than that which usually occurs in the normal work environment.
Title
Provides that where a correction officer, sergeant, captain, corporal, lieutenant, deputy warden or warden employed by the New York state department of corrections and community supervision, the department of correction of the city of New York or any county or municipality files a claim for mental injury premised upon extraordinary work-related stress incurred in a work-related emergency, the board may not disallow the claim, upon a factual finding that the stress was not greater than that which usually occurs in the normal work environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A07777 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - enacting clause stricken