NY S05954 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the business income rate and expanding the small business subtraction modification.
Title
Relates to the business income rate and expanding the small business subtraction modification.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] |
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-02-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5954A |
2020-02-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A06309 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - print number 6309a