NY S05955 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Syracuse to offer an optional twenty year retirement program to police officer Thomas R. Nicolini.
Title
Authorizes the city of Syracuse to offer an optional twenty year retirement program to police officer Thomas R. Nicolini.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.304 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.466 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7890 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1575 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07890 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.304