NY S05958 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain special assessing units other than cities to adjust their current base proportions; gives special and approved assessing units the authority to tailor their "cap" to local conditions each year, thereby removing the annual uncertainty; relates to adjusted base proportions for assessment rolls; relates to the base proportion in approved assessing units in Nassau county.
Title
Allows certain special assessing units other than cities to adjust their current base proportions; gives special and approved assessing units the authority to tailor their "cap" to local conditions each year, thereby removing the annual uncertainty; relates to adjusted base proportions for assessment rolls; relates to the base proportion in approved assessing units in Nassau county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.152 |
2017-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.522 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8407 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1566 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08407 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5958