NY S05958 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - approval memo.68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - approval memo.68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of the office for the aging to establish or approve a sexual discrimination training program; requires the director to regularly update the intake form used to assess individuals seeking to participate in programs or services offered by the office to reflect current professional standards.
Title
Requires the director of the office for the aging to establish or approve a sexual discrimination training program; requires the director to regularly update the intake form used to assess individuals seeking to participate in programs or services offered by the office to reflect current professional standards.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | approval memo.68 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.721 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1782 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5958 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.287 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | rules report cal.287 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-03 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-13 | Senate | referred to aging |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7593 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1782 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A07593 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - approval memo.68