NY S05978 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 5978B
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 5978B
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes regulations for the short term rental of private dwellings; defines terms; requires registration and safety precautions.
Title
Establishes regulations for the short term rental of private dwellings; defines terms; requires registration and safety precautions.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5978B |
2018-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-03-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5978A |
2018-03-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2017-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08065 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in housing