NY S05979 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5979B
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5979B
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the time period for extrajudicial consent and lengthens the time period for payments to a birth mother prior to giving birth and expands the types of unlawful denials of prospective applicants in adoption proceedings; repeals provisions relating to an individual's religious faith when determining placement.
Title
Changes the time period for extrajudicial consent and lengthens the time period for payments to a birth mother prior to giving birth and expands the types of unlawful denials of prospective applicants in adoption proceedings; repeals provisions relating to an individual's religious faith when determining placement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5979B |
2020-03-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-02-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5979A |
2020-02-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |