NY S05983 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any person from slaughtering a horse where such person knows or has reason to know that such horse will be used for human consumption; and prohibits any person from possessing, importing into or exporting from the state, selling, buying, giving away, holding or accepting any horse with the intent of killing, or having another kill, such horse, if such person knows or should have known that any part of such horse will be used for human consumption; and provides penalties for violation.
Title
Prohibits any person from slaughtering a horse where such person knows or has reason to know that such horse will be used for human consumption; and prohibits any person from possessing, importing into or exporting from the state, selling, buying, giving away, holding or accepting any horse with the intent of killing, or having another kill, such horse, if such person knows or should have known that any part of such horse will be used for human consumption; and provides penalties for violation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO AGRICULTURE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2019-11-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5983B |
2019-11-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5983A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
Same As/Similar To
A07871 (Same As) 2020-02-19 - print number 7871a