NY S05987 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes space on the business franchise and personal income tax forms to make a gift for home delivered meals for seniors; creates the senior wellness in nutrition fund.
Title
Establishes space on the business franchise and personal income tax forms to make a gift for home delivered meals for seniors; creates the senior wellness in nutrition fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | approval memo.49 |
2019-12-16 | Senate | signed chap.659 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1356 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5987 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.344 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-04 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4632 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1356 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A04632 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - approval memo.49