NY S05988 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - PRINT NUMBER 5988B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - PRINT NUMBER 5988B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effect and rebuttal of certain medical presumptions relating to heart disease; provides that, for certain members, any condition of impairment of health caused by a disease of the heart, resulting in disability, shall be presumptive evidence that such disability was incurred in the performance and discharge of duty and the natural and proximate result of an accident.
Title
Relates to the effect and rebuttal of certain medical presumptions relating to heart disease; provides that, for certain members, any condition of impairment of health caused by a disease of the heart, resulting in disability, shall be presumptive evidence that such disability was incurred in the performance and discharge of duty and the natural and proximate result of an accident.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5988B |
2020-03-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5988A |
2019-05-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07907 (Same As) 2020-04-08 - print number 7907b