NY S05991 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - approval memo.16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - approval memo.16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the duties of the women veterans coordinator to include: advocating for all women veterans in the state; and the inclusion of the contributions women veterans have made on behalf of the United States and this state on the division's official website.
Title
Increases the duties of the women veterans coordinator to include: advocating for all women veterans in the state; and the inclusion of the contributions women veterans have made on behalf of the United States and this state on the division's official website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-11 | Senate | approval memo.16 |
2019-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.480 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1023 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5991 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.456 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-13 | Senate | referred to veterans' affairs |
2019-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7594 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1023 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A07594 (Same As) 2019-11-11 - approval memo.16