NY S06000 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-26 - APPROVAL MEMO.87
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-26 - APPROVAL MEMO.87
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to definitions and conforming changes pertaining to anatomical gifts (Part A); gift revocation (Part B); dispositions of gifts (Part C); documents of gifts (Part D); duties of donees (Part E); advance directives (Part F); and prohibition of sales of organs (Part G).
Title
Relates to definitions and conforming changes pertaining to anatomical gifts (Part A); gift revocation (Part B); dispositions of gifts (Part C); documents of gifts (Part D); duties of donees (Part E); advance directives (Part F); and prohibition of sales of organs (Part G).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-26 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.87 |
2019-12-26 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.742 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.658 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7800a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1611 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6000A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07800 (Same As) 2019-12-26 - APPROVAL MEMO.87