NY S06007 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - PRINT NUMBER 6007A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - PRINT NUMBER 6007A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of biometric identity verification devices for the purchase of alcoholic beverages and tobacco products; authorizes a licensee, its agent or employee to determine a person's age when purchasing alcoholic beverages or tobacco products by use of a biometric identity verification device; establishes where the use of the device indicates that the person is under the age of twenty-one, the attempted purchase of the alcoholic beverage shall be denied.
Title
Relates to the use of biometric identity verification devices for the purchase of alcoholic beverages and tobacco products; authorizes a licensee, its agent or employee to determine a person's age when purchasing alcoholic beverages or tobacco products by use of a biometric identity verification device; establishes where the use of the device indicates that the person is under the age of twenty-one, the attempted purchase of the alcoholic beverage shall be denied.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6007A |
2020-02-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.974 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05757 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken