NY S06011 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows pharmacies to store medication in automated dispensing machines if a contractual agreement is in place with a nursing home or healthcare facility at such facility for the residents.
Title
Allows pharmacies to store medication in automated dispensing machines if a contractual agreement is in place with a nursing home or healthcare facility at such facility for the residents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1044 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07806 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education