NY S06023 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the provision of criminal history background checks free of charge to mentoring programs operated by not-for-profit corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the provision of criminal history background checks free of charge to mentoring programs operated by not-for-profit corporations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to children and families
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1578
2019-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-16SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES

Same As/Similar To

A07506 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to children and families

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback