NY S06024 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing a program to extend natural gas delivery to unserved or underserved areas; establishes petition, program and commission requirements.
Title
Relates to providing a program to extend natural gas delivery to unserved or underserved areas; establishes petition, program and commission requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2016-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.250 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6024A |
2016-02-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2015-08-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |