NY S06025 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7766
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7766
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes provisions authorizing big game hunting in Seneca county permanent.
Title
Makes provisions authorizing big game hunting in Seneca county permanent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7766 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1908 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07766 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - signed chap.204