NY S06026 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.216
Status: Introduced on June 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.216
Summary
Relates to extending the dates for increasing and imposing malpractice and professional medical conduct insurance rates.
Title
Relates to extending the dates for increasing and imposing malpractice and professional medical conduct insurance rates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED BY A9036 | |
2009-06-30 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.716 | |
2009-06-20 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09036 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.216
S60408 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65007 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S60408 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65007 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06026&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |