NY S06026 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7895A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7895A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mandatory peer review of certified public accountants.
Title
Relates to mandatory peer review of certified public accountants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7895A |
2017-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2171 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6026A |
2017-05-31 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07895 (Same As) 2017-10-23 - signed chap.364