NY S06030 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - approval memo.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - approval memo.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of state to conduct a study on the use of legal material in an electronic format that guarantees the authenticity of and access to such legal materials.
Title
Directs the department of state to conduct a study on the use of legal material in an electronic format that guarantees the authenticity of and access to such legal materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | approval memo.24 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | signed chap.575 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1700 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6030 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.371 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A382 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1700 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00382 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - approval memo.24