NY S06031 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to an internet mapping resource of school age home visiting programs.
Title
Relates to an internet mapping resource of school age home visiting programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.543 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1405 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6031 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.426 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-12 | Senate | referred to children and families |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6575 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1405 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A06575 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.543