NY S06032 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting sanctuary for illegal immigrants.
Title
Relates to prohibiting sanctuary for illegal immigrants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1958 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-03-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6032B |
2016-03-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6032A |
2016-01-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2015-08-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08552 (Same As) 2016-05-10 - held for consideration in governmental operations