NY S06039 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes disability retirement benefits for certain members who suffer any condition or impairment of health caused by diseases of the lung; covers certain titles under the New York city employees' retirement system; provides that covered members who are diagnosed with any condition of impairment of health caused by diseases of the lung, resulting in disability to such member, presently employed, and who shall have sustained such disability while so employed, shall have such diagnosis be presumptive evidence that such disability was incurred in the performance and discharge of duty, unless the contrary be proven by competent evidence.
Title
Establishes disability retirement benefits for certain members who suffer any condition or impairment of health caused by diseases of the lung; covers certain titles under the New York city employees' retirement system; provides that covered members who are diagnosed with any condition of impairment of health caused by diseases of the lung, resulting in disability to such member, presently employed, and who shall have sustained such disability while so employed, shall have such diagnosis be presumptive evidence that such disability was incurred in the performance and discharge of duty, unless the contrary be proven by competent evidence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6039A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09873 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - referred to governmental employees