NY S06044 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-24 - PRINT NUMBER 6044A
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-24 - PRINT NUMBER 6044A
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision to establish and maintain a public website that provides information concerning specific visitation rules, regulations, policies and procedures for all correctional facilities.
Title
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision to establish and maintain a public website that provides information concerning specific visitation rules, regulations, policies and procedures for all correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Thomas Duane [D] | Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Bill Perkins [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Andrea Stewart-Cousins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6044A |
2012-02-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-02-21 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09345 (Same As) 2012-05-02 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION