NY S06044 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.172
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.172
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Manhasset Park District to retroactively apply for a real property tax exemption for certain property in the hamlet of Manhasset, county of Nassau.
Title
Authorizes the Manhasset Park District to retroactively apply for a real property tax exemption for certain property in the hamlet of Manhasset, county of Nassau.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.172 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.56 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a8414a |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2016-02-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-02-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 6044B |
2016-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.172 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-11-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6044A |
2015-11-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2015-09-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08414 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - substituted by s6044b