NY S06045 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-13 - PRINT NUMBER 6045C
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-13 - PRINT NUMBER 6045C
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to coverage for eating disorders; requires comparable coverage for adults and children with eating disorders; defines eating disorder.
Title
Relates to coverage for eating disorders; requires comparable coverage for adults and children with eating disorders; defines eating disorder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6045C |
2018-04-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6045B |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6045A |
2017-05-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06396 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE