NY S06048 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - PRINT NUMBER 6048C
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - PRINT NUMBER 6048C
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing cost-of-living adjustments; increases benefits from fifty to one hundred percent.
Title
Relates to providing cost-of-living adjustments; increases benefits from fifty to one hundred percent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6048C |
2018-06-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-04-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6048B |
2018-04-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-03-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6048A |
2018-03-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10350 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - referred to governmental employees