NY S06059 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires motor vehicle dealers to search for recalls and make certain repairs prior to selling a used motor vehicle.
Title
Requires motor vehicle dealers to search for recalls and make certain repairs prior to selling a used motor vehicle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6059A |
2019-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05194 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION