NY S06061 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - PRINT NUMBER 6061B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - PRINT NUMBER 6061B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes members of the state police who drove or rode in vehicles used in cleanup operations within the definition of participation in World Trade Center rescue, recovery or cleanup operations.
Title
Includes members of the state police who drove or rode in vehicles used in cleanup operations within the definition of participation in World Trade Center rescue, recovery or cleanup operations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6061B |
2020-03-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6061A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |