NY S06062 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes school districts to enter into a lease outside of such school district when it is demonstrated to the satisfaction of the commissioner of education that extenuating circumstances exist which necessitate a lease outside of the school district.
Title
Authorizes school districts to enter into a lease outside of such school district when it is demonstrated to the satisfaction of the commissioner of education that extenuating circumstances exist which necessitate a lease outside of the school district.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to education |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.303 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1059 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07850 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education