NY S06079 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 6079A
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows credit unions, savings banks, savings and loan associations and federal savings associations to accept and secure deposits from municipal corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows credit unions, savings banks, savings and loan associations and federal savings associations to accept and secure deposits from municipal corporations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 6079A
2019-06-13SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS
2019-05-21SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO BANKS
2019-05-16SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A03262 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - reported referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback