NY S06090 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.313
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to probationary periods for tenure in certain school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to probationary periods for tenure in certain school districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.313
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-12Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.103
2018-06-12Assemblysubstituted for a8108a
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to education
2018-06-11AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenateREPASSED SENATE
2018-06-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 6090A
2018-06-06SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-05Senatereturned to senate
2018-06-05AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2018-03-28Assemblyreferred to education
2018-03-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-03-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-03-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-03-21Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-03-20Senate1ST REPORT CAL.690
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-08Assemblyreferred to education
2017-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1178
2017-05-11SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A08108 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - substituted by s6090a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06090&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06090&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06090
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06090&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06090A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6090#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6090#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6090#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6090#SF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6090#SF3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06090&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback