NY S06100 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to permissible fees in connection with open end loans.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of provisions of law relating to permissible fees in connection with open end loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.82 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.564 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a7668 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2019-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1175 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A07668 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.82