NY S06101 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary state commission to be known as the New York state reforest, restore and sustainable agriculture commission to evaluate and make recommendations concerning the reforestation and restoration of forests and ecological habitats in the state of New York.
Title
Establishes a temporary state commission to be known as the New York state reforest, restore and sustainable agriculture commission to evaluate and make recommendations concerning the reforestation and restoration of forests and ecological habitats in the state of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6101B |
2019-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6101A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08327 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation