NY S06113 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enacting the "toll payer protection act" which includes a toll by mail system for the payment of tolls by electronic toll devices; provides for the repeal of such system five years after the enactment of such system.
Title
Relates to enacting the "toll payer protection act" which includes a toll by mail system for the payment of tolls by electronic toll devices; provides for the repeal of such system five years after the enactment of such system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-13 | Senate | vetoed memo.201 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1702 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6113A |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.399 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.399 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-23 | Senate | print number 7587a |
2019-05-23 | Senate | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-10 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7587A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1702 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6113A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07587 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - tabled