NY S06128 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes references in law from "hearing impaired" to "deaf or hard of hearing".
Title
Changes references in law from "hearing impaired" to "deaf or hard of hearing".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7178 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.152 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07178 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.221