NY S06137 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8003
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8003
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for service by mail to a nominated executor's domicile when exercising the right of election by a surviving spouse.
Title
Allows for service by mail to a nominated executor's domicile when exercising the right of election by a surviving spouse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8003 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.324 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A08003 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.228