NY S06151 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - signed chap.104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - signed chap.104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the transport of pistols or revolvers by licensees.
Title
Relates to the transport of pistols or revolvers by licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | signed chap.104 |
2019-07-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.983 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6151 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.192 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | rules report cal.192 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-20 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7752 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.983 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07752 (Same As) 2019-07-16 - signed chap.104