NY S06160 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the New York state energy research and development authority to study significantly improving high-performance efficiency in commercial office buildings.
Title
Authorizes the New York state energy research and development authority to study significantly improving high-performance efficiency in commercial office buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6255 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.716 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1914 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06255 (Same As) 2018-10-01 - signed chap.297