NY S06160 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-03 - SIGNED CHAP.244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-03 - SIGNED CHAP.244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants access to local and state law enforcement of records of applications for licenses of firearms.
Title
Grants access to local and state law enforcement of records of applications for licenses of firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.244 |
2019-09-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.404 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7739 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1203 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07739 (Same As) 2019-09-03 - SIGNED CHAP.244