NY S06161 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts provisions for the protection of the health, safety and employment rights of persons suffering employment loss from the closure of nuclear electric plants; relates to the transfer or lease of closed electric generators; relates to payment of prevailing wages of affected employees of the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant.
Title
Enacts provisions for the protection of the health, safety and employment rights of persons suffering employment loss from the closure of nuclear electric plants; relates to the transfer or lease of closed electric generators; relates to payment of prevailing wages of affected employees of the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6161A |
2019-06-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06050 (Same As) 2020-01-06 - enacting clause stricken