NY S06165 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the maximum limit on the amount of a single linked loan and increases the maximum amount a business can borrow during the life of the linked loan program.
Title
Removes the maximum limit on the amount of a single linked loan and increases the maximum amount a business can borrow during the life of the linked loan program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.475 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1362 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07688 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means