NY S06167 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - signed chap.179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - signed chap.179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the awards available to certain victims of unlawful surveillance crimes.
Title
Limits the awards available to certain victims of unlawful surveillance crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.179 |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1176 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6167 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-04-09 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-04-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.59 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | rules report cal.59 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-09 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-04-09 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-09 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-04 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7079 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1176 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07079 (Same As) 2019-08-21 - signed chap.179