NY S06169 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.285
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.285
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the state single audit program and municipalities and public authorities that are required in any fiscal year to have a federal single audit performed under 2 CFR 200.501(a).
Title
Relates to the state single audit program and municipalities and public authorities that are required in any fiscal year to have a federal single audit performed under 2 CFR 200.501(a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.285 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1829 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6169A |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.295 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | rules report cal.295 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-12 | Senate | amend and recommit to rules 7945a |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-29 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7945A |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1829 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6169A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07945 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.285