NY S06177 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 6177A
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 6177A
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to eliminating rent for homeless shelters; provides that a homeless individual or family applying for or receiving temporary housing assistance shall not be required to pay room and board or contribute any earned or unearned income, available benefits or resources to eliminate their need for temporary housing assistance or as a condition to receive temporary housing assistance from such provider.
Title
Relates to eliminating rent for homeless shelters; provides that a homeless individual or family applying for or receiving temporary housing assistance shall not be required to pay room and board or contribute any earned or unearned income, available benefits or resources to eliminate their need for temporary housing assistance or as a condition to receive temporary housing assistance from such provider.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6177A |
2020-01-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A07612 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - reported referred to codes