NY S06185 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of transportation to establish, maintain, monitor and publicize a hotline operated and maintained by the department of motor vehicles through which any person may report safety issues with stretch limousines and to use such reports when determining withdrawing a motor carrier's operating authority or denying applications for new or revised operating authority.
Title
Requires the commissioner of transportation to establish, maintain, monitor and publicize a hotline operated and maintained by the department of motor vehicles through which any person may report safety issues with stretch limousines and to use such reports when determining withdrawing a motor carrier's operating authority or denying applications for new or revised operating authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | signed chap.5 |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.74 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6185B |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-01-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-14 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.3 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | rules report cal.3 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-10 | Senate | print number 8214b |
2020-01-10 | Senate | amend and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Senate | print number 8214a |
2020-01-08 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-06-07 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2020-01-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8214B |
2020-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.74 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6185B |
2020-01-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6185A |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1151 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08214 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - signed chap.5