NY S06186 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to drug and alcohol testing and requirements for for-hire vehicle drivers and motor carriers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to drug and alcohol testing and requirements for for-hire vehicle drivers and motor carriers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06Assemblyreferred to transportation
2019-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-06-03SenateAMENDED (T) 6186A
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1084
2019-05-21SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A00712 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - referred to transportation
S03023 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback