NY S06189 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the stretch limousine passenger safety task force to conduct a comprehensive review of matters influencing the safety, adequacy, efficiency, and reliability of stretch limousine transportation of passengers for compensation.
Title
Establishes the stretch limousine passenger safety task force to conduct a comprehensive review of matters influencing the safety, adequacy, efficiency, and reliability of stretch limousine transportation of passengers for compensation.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
Sen. James Tedisco [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | signed chap.3 |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.78 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6189C |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-01-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-14 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.2 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | rules report cal.2 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported |
2020-01-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-10 | Senate | print number 1316c |
2020-01-10 | Senate | amend and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Senate | print number 1316b |
2020-01-08 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-05-29 | Senate | print number 1316a |
2019-05-29 | Senate | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-01-14 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2020-01-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1316C |
2020-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.78 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6189C |
2020-01-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6189B |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED 6189A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1087 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01316 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - signed chap.3