NY S06190 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that prior to the issuance of taxicab, limousine, commuter van, paratransit or for-hire vehicle driver or owner licenses for vehicles transporting nine or more passengers, the applicant shall be fingerprinted by the authority authorized to issue such licenses for the purpose of securing criminal history records from both the state division of criminal justice services and the federal bureau of investigation.
Title
Requires that prior to the issuance of taxicab, limousine, commuter van, paratransit or for-hire vehicle driver or owner licenses for vehicles transporting nine or more passengers, the applicant shall be fingerprinted by the authority authorized to issue such licenses for the purpose of securing criminal history records from both the state division of criminal justice services and the federal bureau of investigation.
Sponsors
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6190B |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 6190A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1088 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03286 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation
S05405 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S05405 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN